judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-6419
A-6419
06/21/1957
Application for Writ of Error
COASTAL STATES GAS PRODUCING COMPANY, STATE OF TEXAS
J. E. PATE, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/25/1957Response to PetitionPetitioner
08/15/1957Reply to ResponsePetitioner
07/03/1957Response to PetitionRespondent
06/21/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
06/21/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/12/1958Opinion issued
11/25/1957Response to Petition
10/02/1957Document received (See Remarks)
08/15/1957Reply to Response
07/03/1957Response to Petition
06/21/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
06/21/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
06/21/1957Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
J. E. Pate, et al.Respondent
Coastal States Gas Producing CompanyPetitioner
State of TexasPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information