judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-6409
A-6409
06/17/1957
Application for Writ of Error
ANNA KARLING
LOWER COLORADO RIVER AUTHORITY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/11/1957Motion for RehearingPetitioner
09/11/1957Response to Brief filedPetitioner
09/09/1957Response to Brief filedRespondent
07/06/1957Reply to ResponsePetitioner
06/27/1957Response to PetitionRespondent
06/17/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/16/1957Response to Motion filed
10/11/1957Motion for RehearingOverruled
09/11/1957Response to Brief filed
09/09/1957Response to Brief filed
07/06/1957Reply to Response
06/27/1957Response to Petition
06/17/1957Application for Writ of Error - Filed
06/17/1957Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Anna KarlingPetitioner
Lower Colorado River AuthorityRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information