judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-4337
A-4337
07/31/1953
Application for Writ of Error
GROENDYKE TRANSPORT COMPANY, INC. AND EVERETT STALLINGS
J. C. DYE AND WIFE, FERN DYE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
08/10/1953Response to PetitionRespondent
07/31/1953Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/15/1953Motion to dismissFiling granted
11/24/1953Motion for Extension of Time filed
10/21/1953Document received (See Remarks)
10/21/1953Document received (See Remarks)
10/21/1953Document received (See Remarks)
08/10/1953Response to Petition
07/31/1953Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Groendyke Transport Company, Inc. and Everett StallingsPetitioner
J. C. Dye and wife, Fern DyeRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information