judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RIO RANCHO LANDOWNERS VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 36370
Short Caption:RIO RANCHO LANDOWNERS VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A413020Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:12/12/2000 at 9:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:12/12/2000How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/03/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Rawlings Olson Cannon Gormley & Desruisseaux--check no. 054058.
07/03/2000Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. 00-11283
07/03/2000Petition/WritFiled Points and Authorities in Support of Petition for Writ. 00-11284
07/17/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due from the real party in interest: 30 days from the date of this order. 00-12238
08/14/2000Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. 00-14156
09/01/2000MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Petitioner's Motion for Permission for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. 00-15501
09/14/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. On September 1, 2000, petitioners filed a motion for leave to file a reply to the answer. The motion is unopposed. We grant petitioners' motion, and direct the clerk of this court to file the reply received on September 1, 2000. 00-16245
09/14/2000Petition/WritFiled Reply to Answer to Petition. Petitioner's Reply to Real Party in Interest's Answer to the Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. 00-15503
10/30/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on December 12, 2000 at 9:00 a.m. in Carson City. (NNP00A-MS/DA/ML)
11/27/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
12/12/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Northern Nevada Panel. NNP00A-MS/DA/ML
12/26/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. for Real Party in Interest's Counsel (Patrick T. Nohrden). 00-22434
01/29/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order Denying in Part and Granting in Part Petition for Writ of Prohibition. " . . . we deny the petition for a writ of prohibition as to Rio Rancho and Ownby . . . we grant the petition as to Reno and direct the clerk of this court to issue a writ of prohibition." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 01-01862
01/29/2001WritIssued Writ. Original and one copy of writ and copy of order mailed to James R. Olson for service upon Judge Stephen L. Huffaker. 01-01918
02/05/2001WritFiled Writ. Served on Judge Steven L. Huffaker on February 2, 2001. 01-01918
02/26/2001RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 01-01947
02/26/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.