judyrecords
search tips
660 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ALPINE LUMBER COMPANY and ALPINE INSTALLATIONS, LLC v. CAPITAL WEST NATIONAL BANK

Case Heading (S-09-0057)
Case Number:S-09-0057Case Docketed On:03/25/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Liens (Title 29)
Short Title:ALPINE LUMBER COMPANY and ALPINE INSTALLATIONS, LLC v. CAPITAL WEST NATIONAL BANK
Full Title:ALPINE LUMBER COMPANY and ALPINE INSTALLATIONS, LLC, Appellants (Defendants), v. CAPITAL WEST NATIONAL BANK, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantAlpine Lumber CompanyPatrick Dixon
AppellantAlpine Installations, LLCPatrick Dixon
AppelleeCapital West National BankJohn C. Patton
Terry Wynn Connolly

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Liens
Opinion Number:20140 WY 62
Citation:231 P.3d 869 (Wyo. 2010).

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/25/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/25/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/25/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/25/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/08/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
05/11/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/22/2009Brief - Appellee; and statement of costsBriefAppelleeFinal
06/22/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellee; and Rule 10.01 statement of costs.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/29/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
07/10/2009Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
07/13/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/24/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
07/24/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, three volumes (original papers).RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/24/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/01/2009Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
05/18/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/03/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/03/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
06/03/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/03/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/08/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 6/7/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal