judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DANTE E. ARMWOOD V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1578
Short Caption:DANTE E. ARMWOOD V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-5647-10Filed Date:12/17/2010

Opening Event Date:12/17/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/08/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/11/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Dineen A. BakerNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/17/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/05/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Mindy A. Daniels, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
01/05/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Mindy A. Daniels, Esquire
02/02/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
03/08/2011RECORD INDEX
03/08/2011RECORD COPIES
03/08/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (97 pgs/Jeon) 8/23-25/10 proc.
03/08/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (220 pgs/Hamilton) 8/26/10 proc.
03/08/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (64 pgs/Hamilton) 8/27/10 proc.
03/08/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (10 pgs/Hamilton) 8/30/10 proc.
03/08/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (21 pgs/tape) 11/19/10 proc. w/cd
03/08/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/15/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (gun offender reg & cert order---Judge Keary -- filed 11/19/10)
03/17/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
04/28/2011 On consideration of this court's order of March 17, 2011, directing appellant to file the brief and the limited appendix within 40 days, and it appearing that the brief and the appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall w/in 20 days from the date of this order submit the brief and the limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
04/28/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 7/6/11. no oppo
05/05/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before July 6, 2011. (JAC)
07/06/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo to 9/7/11
07/12/2011FiledOn consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before September 7, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (pii)
09/08/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief until October 4, 2011 (Appellant)
09/27/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for extension to 10/4/11.
10/04/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief and Appendix until October 31, 2011 (Appellant)
10/14/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for extension to file brief and the limited appendix to 10/31/11.
11/02/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
11/08/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief to 11/10/11.
11/14/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief and Appendix until November 21, 2011 (Appellant)Granted
11/30/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
12/20/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motions for extensions of time within which to file the brief and limited appendix
01/11/2012FiledMotion For Leave to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
01/20/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave to file lodged brief and limited appendix of appellant and appellee's brief due w/n 30 days.
01/20/2012FiledBrief (Appellant)
01/20/2012FiledAppendix (Appellant)
02/16/2012FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (Appellee)Granted
02/21/2012FiledTMC//MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE//OPPO
02/23/2012FiledOpposition to motion for summary affirmance. (Appellant)
05/18/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion for Summary Affirmance
05/18/2012FiledAffirmed
06/11/2012FiledMandate
03/05/2013FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)