judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-4301
A-4301
07/10/1953
Application for Writ of Error
A. W. JONES, ET AL.
UNA C. ELLIOTT, ET VIR
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/11/1954Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
01/11/1954Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
12/24/1953Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/13/1953Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
11/13/1953Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
10/22/1953Motion for RehearingPetitioner
07/20/1953Response to PetitionRespondent
07/10/1953Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/11/1954Amicus Curiae Brief received
01/11/1954Brief in Support of Petition
12/24/1953Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/09/1953Opinion issued
11/13/1953Amicus Curiae Brief received
11/13/1953Brief in Support of Petition
10/22/1953Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/20/1953Response to Petition
07/10/1953Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/10/1953Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Butane Dealers AssociationAmicus Curiae
Una C. Elliott, et virRespondent
A. W. Jones, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information