judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-4335
A-4335
07/31/1953
Application for Writ of Error
TOM ORSBORN
DEEP ROCK OIL CORPORATION, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/20/1954Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
04/13/1954Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/10/1954Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/05/1954Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
08/23/1953Reply to ResponsePetitioner
08/10/1953Response to PetitionRespondent
07/31/1953Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/09/1955Letter Filed
04/20/1954Supplemental Brief filed
04/13/1954Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/10/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/31/1954Dissenting opinion issued.
03/31/1954Opinion issued
01/05/1954Supplemental Brief filed
10/28/1953Additional Copies received
10/28/1953Document received (See Remarks)
10/28/1953Document received (See Remarks)
08/23/1953Reply to Response
08/10/1953Response to Petition
07/31/1953Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/31/1953Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Tom OrsbornPetitioner
Leslie HumphreyAmicus Curiae
Deep Rock Oil Corporation, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information