judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-94-00211-CV
04-94-00211-CV
04/19/1994
Mandamus/prohibition
State Farm Lloyds Insurance Company, Relator
The Honorable Anthony Cantu, Respondent
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/09/1994Order EnteredDismissed
05/09/1994Order EnteredDismissed
05/09/1994Order EnteredDismissed
05/09/1994Order EnteredDismissed
05/09/1994Order EnteredDismissed
05/09/1994Order EnteredDismissed
05/06/1994Motion DisposedFiling is Moot
05/06/1994Motion DisposedFiling is Moot
05/06/1994Motion f/l/file Mandamus DisposedFiling is Moot
05/06/1994Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/03/1994Motion for Dismissal Filed
04/27/1994Motion Filed
04/19/1994Exhibits received
04/19/1994No Description Available.
04/19/1994Motion Filed
04/19/1994Writ of Mandamus Received
04/19/1994Motion f/l/file Mandamus Filed
04/19/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/06/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
John And Marilyn SibertAppelleeRichard A. Bentley
Trial JudgeAppelleeHonorable Antonio Cantu
State Farm Lloyds Ins. Co.AppellantCarol A. Jenson
Mark A. Lindow
Danita J. Jarreau
Trial Court Information
288th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Antonio G Cantu
92-CI-16613
n/a