judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PATE (RICKY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34893
Short Caption:PATE (RICKY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 34516 , 34989 , 37259
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C158327Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/27/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived. 02/04/00 Order: transferred to Docket No. 34989.
09/27/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 02/04/00 Order: transferred to Docket No. 34989. 99-09207
09/30/1999Order/CounselFiled Order/Fast Track/Counsel. Appellant filed his notice of appeal in proper person.This appeal is governed by NRAP 3C. Attorney William Wolfbrandt shall file the transcript request form within10 days and a fast track statement within 40 days. 02/04/00 Order: transferred to docket No. 34989. 99-09375
10/21/1999Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Letter from Attorney William Wolfbrandt re: his appointment as counsel in this matter. 02/04/00 Order: transferred to docket no. 34989. 99-10308
12/06/1999Order/CounselFiled Order/Fast Track/Counsel. On October 21, 1999, this court received a letter from Wolfbrandt. We remind counsel that the proper way to request action from this court is by motion pursuant to NRAP 27. Counsel's letter is therefore of no effect, and Wolfbrandt remains counsel of record in thi appeal. Wolfbrandt shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 15 days of this order or show cause why he should not be sanctioned. 02/04/00 Order: transferred to Docket No. 34989. 99-12129
12/27/1999MotionFiled Motion. 02/04/00 Order: transferred to Docket No. 34989. 99-13170
01/06/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On December 27, 1999, appellant's counsel, William L. Wolfbrandt, filed a motion to withdraw as attorney of record. Wolfbrandt has represented to this court that Clark County Deputy Public Defender Tim O'Brien was appointed counsel during the gult phase of appellant's trial and has assumed responsibility of pursuing this appeal. O'Brien shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file with the district court a rough draft transcript request form and shall have 40 days to file the fast track statement. We decline to rule on Wolfbrandt's motion of December 27, 1999, until such time as O'Brien enters a formal appearance in this appeal. 02/04/00 Order: transferred to Docket No. 34989. 00-00190
01/13/2000MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate. Motion to Consolidate Cases. (Nos. 34893 and 34989). 02/04/00 Order: transferred to docket No. 34989. 00-00559
02/04/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order to Administratively Close Docket. We direct the clerk of this court to administratively close Docket No. 34893. The clerk shall transfer to docket No. 34989 all documents filed or received in Docket No. 34893. This appeal from the judgment of conviction shall proceed under docket No. 34989. fn1[We deny as moot appellant's motion to consolidate these appeals. The motion indicates that counsel is under the impression that a reply brief is due on or before February 6, 2000. To the extent that the motion seeks permission to file a reply brief, it is hereby denied.] Nos. 34893, 34989. 00-01822
02/04/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.