judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JACOB LOVATO v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0073)
Case Number:S-09-0073Case Docketed On:04/08/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:JACOB LOVATO v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JACOB LOVATO, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJacob LovatoDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Jenny Lynn Craig

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Search and Seizure -Traffic Stop
Opinion Number:2010 WY 38
Citation:228 P.3d 55

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/08/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/08/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/08/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/26/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
05/26/2009Event - Hardcopy received. Brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/04/2009Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
07/01/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
07/02/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/13/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
07/20/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/24/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
07/24/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, four volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential Folder; Volume IV, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/24/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
07/27/2009Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
09/01/2009Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
03/26/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/13/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/13/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/13/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/13/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/15/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 4/14/10ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal