judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SAMUEL ADDO V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA BOARD OF NURSING

Case Information: 10-AA-1608
Short Caption:SAMUEL ADDO V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA BOARD OF NURSINGClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Bd of Nursing (BNURS)
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Not SpecifiedFiled Date:12/29/2010

Opening Event Date:12/29/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/20/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/05/2011
Argued/Submitted:02/29/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/23/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerSamuel Addo N
H. Jeffrey Ziegler YN
RespondentD.C. Board of NursingN
Todd S. KimNY
Carl J. SchifferleYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/29/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW (RECEIVED ONLY - filing fee will be transmitted on 12/30/10)
12/30/2010FILING FEE of $100.00 paid
01/03/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD and Todd Kim, Esq.
03/18/2011PETITIONER'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION to compel the filing of the record.
04/06/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR STAY- of revocation pending appeal
04/08/2011TMC - motion to stay - oppo - motion to compel record
04/18/2011RESPONDENT'S OPPOSITION to motion to stay.
04/20/2011RECORD ON APPEAL ( 2 binders one black, one white)
04/20/2011 ORDERED that the MOTION TO STAY the order of revocation pending appeal IS DENIED... It is FURTHER ORDERED that the MOTION TO COMPEL the filing of the record IS DENIED AS MOOT. (BROBST)
04/20/2011RECORD COMPLETED
04/22/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
06/01/2011PETITIONER'S BRIEF
06/01/2011APPENDIX
07/05/2011RESPONDENT'S BRIEF
07/05/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
08/01/2011FiledReply Brief (Petitioner)
08/10/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
12/02/2011FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
12/15/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
02/29/2012FiledArgued before Judges Glickman, Thompson, Steadman H. Jeffrey Ziegler, Esq. for petitioner Carl J. Schifferle, Esq. for respondent
03/30/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Glickman and Thompson, Associate Judges, and Steadman, Senior Judge.)
04/23/2012FiledMandate