judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-94-00197-CV
13-94-00197-CV
04/20/1994
Divorce
Johansen, Harald Magnus
Grahn, Emily Jean
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/25/1995Mandate Issued
08/10/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/04/1995Submitted
05/04/1995Submission
02/02/1995Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
01/18/1995Submission
11/14/1994Brief Filed
11/14/1994Case ready to be set
11/14/1994Certificate Filed
11/14/1994List of Parties
11/14/1994Oral argument requested
10/17/1994Green card in
10/13/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/13/1994Order Entered
06/22/1994request for documents
05/20/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/13/1994Supplemental transcript filed
04/28/1994Statement Filed
04/28/1994Certified copy of affidavit in lieu of bond
04/25/1994Green card in
04/22/199410 day letter sent
04/20/1994Transcript Filed
04/20/1994Transcript Received
04/20/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/25/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Johansen, Harald MagnusAppellantHarald Magnus Johansen
Grahn, Emily JeanAppelleeEmily Grahn
Trial Court Information
214th District Court
Nueces
Honorable Michael J. Westergren
93-5283-F