judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-94-00368-CV
01-94-00368-CV
04/19/1994
Miscellaneous/other civil
Royale Record Company
Rap-A-Lot Records, Inc., et al
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/23/1995Mandate issued - criminal or civil
01/23/1995Mandate issued - criminal or civil
11/03/1994Opinion issuedDismissed
11/03/1994Opinion issuedDismissed
09/15/1994Motion for leave to fileGrant motion
08/29/1994Motion to dismiss appeal
08/25/1994Motion to withdraw as counsel disposed - no new attorney to substitute in as counselGrant motion
08/22/1994Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
08/19/1994Motion to dismiss appeal
08/16/1994Motion to withdraw as counsel filed - no new attorney to substitute in as counsel
08/11/1994Notice of dismissal
06/09/1994Motion strans disposedGrant motion
06/09/1994Supplemental transcript filed
05/25/1994Motion for leave to file strans
05/05/1994Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
04/21/1994Filing Fee in the amount of $50 paid-trans filed
04/20/1994Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
04/20/1994No description available.
04/19/1994Transcript filed
04/19/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/21/1994Appeal bond filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppelleeAmy Dunn Taylor
StateAppelleeChristina H. Patierno
StateAppellantDavid C. Holmes
StateAppelleeBen Taylor
StateAppelleeRobert S. Hoffman
Trial Court Information
151st District Court
Harris
Honorable CAROLYN C. GARCIA
92-29117