judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 09-94-00148-CR
09-94-00148-CR
04/19/1994
Robbery
Harris, Carl Ray
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/03/1995Mandate Issued
01/03/1995MANDATE ISSUED FROM HIGHER COURT AND CASE STORED
11/16/1994Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/25/1994Submitted
10/25/1994Submission
08/30/1994Brief Filed
08/30/1994Case ready to be set
08/11/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
08/09/1994Brief Filed
08/09/1994Brief received, not filed
08/08/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
07/08/1994Statement of Facts Filed
06/20/1994Transcript Filed
04/19/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
04/19/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/03/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Dillard, BeverlyDistrict or County ClerksDebbie Usoff
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasRodney D. Conerly
Harris, Carl RayAppellantDouglas M. Barlow
Trial Court Information
252nd District Court
Jefferson
66378
life