judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-4713
A-4713
06/02/1954
Application for Writ of Error
MRS. L. P. WALTERS
CENTURY LLOYDS INSURANCE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/01/1954Motion for RehearingRespondent
06/02/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/02/1954Document received (See Remarks)
12/01/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/17/1954Opinion issued
07/14/1954Document received (See Remarks)
06/02/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
06/02/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Century Lloyds Insurance CompanyRespondent
Mrs. L. P. WaltersPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information