judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WILLIE EARL SUTTON, III v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0072)
Case Number:S-09-0072Case Docketed On:04/07/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:WILLIE EARL SUTTON, III v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:WILLIE EARL SUTTON, III, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantWillie Earl Sutton IIIDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Search and Seizure -Traffic Stop
Opinion Number:2009 WY 148
Citation:220 P.3d 784 (Wyo. 2009)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/07/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/07/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/07/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/26/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
05/26/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/26/2009Notice-Incoming - Other. Received copy of motion for judgement and sentence nun pro tunc filed in District Court.Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
06/24/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/25/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/01/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
07/13/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/14/2009Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
07/20/2009Motion - Supplement the recordMotionSupplement the recordFinal
07/22/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's motion to supplement the record; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/22/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, four volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Exhibits; Volume IV, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/18/2009Order - Granting Motion to Supplement RecordOrderGrantFinal
08/21/2009Record - Supplemental record on appeal, one additional volume, Volume V, original papers.RecordSupplemental record on appealFinal
08/21/2009Notice-Outgoing - Supplemental record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingSupplemental record on appeal filedFinal
09/01/2009Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
12/09/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Kite writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/29/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/29/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/29/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/29/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/04/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 12/30/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal