judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ELAINE TINSLEY V. PROFESSIONAL HEALTH CARE RESOURCES

Case Information: 10-AA-1607
Short Caption:ELAINE TINSLEY V. PROFESSIONAL HEALTH CARE RESOURCESClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES2512-10Filed Date:12/28/2010

Opening Event Date:12/28/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/20/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/24/2011
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/10/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerElaine Tinsley N
Colleen Shanahan NN
Jane H. Aiken NN
Timothy Bazzle YN
RespondentProfessional Health Care ResourcesN
Aaron J. Walker NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/28/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW (nunc pro tunc)
12/28/2010PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
01/13/2011ORDER GRANT PTNR MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, and the Clerk shall file the lodged petition for review nunc pro tunc to December 28, 2010. F/ORDERED that Office of Administrative Hearings shall file the record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). FURTHER ORDERED that respondent shall within 30 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (a)(5). (ETW)
02/25/2011 On consideration of this court's order of January 13, 2011, directing respondent to identify its counsel within 30 days from the date of the order, and it appearing that respondent has failed to comply with the order, it is ORDERED that respondent shall within 15 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (a)(5). Failure to comply with this order shall result in respondent being prohibited from filing its brief. (JAC)
03/17/2011APPEARANCE- of Timothy Bazzle behalf of petitoner
03/31/2011APPEARANCE- of Tim Bazzel supervised by: Jane H.Aikens & Colleen Shanahan on behalf of petitioner 2nd
04/20/2011RECORD ON APPEAL w/hearing of 11/23/10
04/20/2011RECORD COMPLETED
04/22/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the limited appendix, including documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
05/13/2011PETITIONER'S BRIEF
05/13/2011APPENDIX
06/08/2011RECEIVED- supplemental certificate of service to petitioner's brief
07/19/2011FiledMotion For Summary Reversal (Titled as: Motion to Reverse the decision of the OAH) (Petitioner)
07/28/2011FiledTMC-MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL
10/24/2011FiledORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL AND THIS APPEAL SHALL BE SCHEDULED ON THE REC AND PETITIONER'S BRIEF ALONE
10/24/2011FiledBriefing Completed
10/24/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
01/06/2012FiledJoint Motion For Summary Disposition (Petitioner & Respondent)
01/06/2012FiledJoint Stipulation To Dismiss Appeal (Petitioner Tinsley, Respondent Professional Health Care Resources)
01/17/2012FiledOrder Granting Joint Stipulation To Dismiss Appeal
01/17/2012FiledVacated - order on appeal
01/17/2012FiledDismissed - petition for review
02/10/2012FiledMandate