judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SHINGLETON (RICHARD) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34892
Short Caption:SHINGLETON (RICHARD) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 34780 , 37218
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C154463Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/27/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/27/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09206
11/18/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. " . . . we dismiss this appeal without prejudice to appellant's right to pursue a timely appeal from a final, appealable order of the district court." fn1[Appellant was recently convicted in the district court. The judgmentof conviction was entered on August 26, 1999. If appellant intended to appeal from the judgment of conviction, we note that appellant already has an appeal pending from the conviction (Docket No. 34780).]. NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 99-11480
12/14/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-12588
12/14/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/03/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 20, 1999. 99-12588