judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: 94-0358
94-0358
04/20/1994
App Writ of Error
HELEN B. MORRIS
FRANK OLIVER
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/08/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/05/1994Reply to ResponseRespondent
04/20/1994Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/08/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/28/1994Record returned to Court of AppealsNo Mo/Re filed
05/25/1994Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDenied
05/05/1994Case forwarded to Court
05/05/1994Reply to Response
04/20/1994Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
06/28/1994Case StoredCase stored.No Mo/Re filed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
MORRIS, HELEN B.PetitionerMs. Deborah Heaton McElvaney
Mr. John R. Shrode
OLIVER, FRANKRespondentMr. Alvaro J. Iglesias
Mr. Lance Olinde Jr.
Court of Appeals Information:
Reversed & Remanded
RULE 90, 03-17-94
14th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
151st District Court
Harris
Honorable Carolyn Clause Garcia
91-62316