judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: AP-71,835
AP-71,835
04/20/1994
Appeal Case Type
LANE, DOIL EDWARD
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
02/12/1996SUPP BR FILEDState
12/05/1995BRIEF FILEDState
06/08/1995BRIEF FILEDAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/26/1998REQ PREPYMT DISPDENIED
02/24/1998REQ PREPYMT RECD
01/22/1998REQ PREPYMT MADE
01/15/1998REQ PREPYMT DISPGranted
01/14/1998REQ PREPYMT RECD
11/14/1997MOTION FILED
06/11/1997APPT COUNSEL/ORDERGranted
05/28/1997MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD - DISPOSITIONGranted
05/27/1997MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FILED
03/17/1997APPT COUNSEL/ORDERGranted
01/23/1997TC NOTICE RECEIVED
11/22/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the mandate of a process
11/22/1996MANDATE ISSD
11/06/1996OPINION ISSDAffirmed
11/06/1996OPINION ISSDAffirmed
11/06/1996OPINION ISSDAffirmed
11/06/1996OPINION ISSDAffirmed
02/12/1996SUPP BR FILED
01/31/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submitted of a process
01/31/1996SUBMITTED
01/17/1996NOTICE OF COUNSEL PRESENTING ARGUMENT
01/08/1996NOTICE OF COUNSEL PRESENTING ARGUMENT
12/06/1995Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submission of a process
12/06/1995SET FOR SUBMIS
12/05/1995BRIEF FILED
12/05/1995SUPP TR FILED
10/16/1995EXT BRIEF DISP/NFEGranted
10/13/1995EXT BRIEF FILED
07/13/1995EXT BRIEF DISPGranted
07/13/1995EXT BRIEF FILED
06/08/1995BRIEF FILED
05/16/1995EXT BRIEF DISP/NFEGranted
05/15/1995EXT BRIEF FILED
04/11/1995EXT BRIEF DISP/NFEGranted
04/06/1995EXT BRIEF FILED
02/23/1995EXT BRIEF DISPGranted
02/23/1995EXT BRIEF FILED
01/18/1995EXT BRIEF DISPGranted
01/17/1995EXT BRIEF FILED
10/31/1994EXT BRIEF DISPGranted
10/31/1994EXT BRIEF FILED
10/18/1994SF FILED DP
08/25/1994EXT SF DISP/NFEGranted
08/25/1994EXT SF FILED
05/23/1994TRANSCRIPT FILED
04/26/1994EXT SF DISPGranted
04/26/1994EXT SF FILED
04/20/1994DP BEGIN
04/20/1994DP BEGIN
04/20/1994EXT CLK TRAN DISPGranted
04/20/1994EXT CLK TRAN FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/22/1996STOREDCASE STORED
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJr., Marcos Hernandez
LANE, DOIL EDWARDApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Victoria Verna Langham
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information
22nd District Court
Hays
Honorable CHARLES RAMSAY
CR-93-454