judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JACKSON (CALVIN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34890
Short Caption:JACKSON (CALVIN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 37446 , 37745 , 47319
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C156105Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/22/2000How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/27/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/27/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for Appellant). 99-09202
10/11/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-09794
10/11/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 4/6/99, 4/8/99, 4/9/99, 4/12/99, 4/13/99 through 4/16/99 and 8/25/99. To Court Reporter: Tina Smith. 99-09801
12/23/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. 04/06/99; 04/08/99; 04/09/99; 04/12/99; 04/13/99; 04/14/99; 04/15/99; 04/16/99 and 08/25/99 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Tina B. Smith. 99-13102
01/04/2000MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: February 21, 2000. 00-00070
02/23/2000MotionFiled Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 31 pages. 00-02844
02/23/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: express mail-no postmark. 00-02845
02/23/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols/ I and II. 00-02846
03/24/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 00-04773
04/25/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 00-06673
08/04/2000Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. addressed to Calvin O'Neil Jackson from Jeff M. Banks, Deputy P.D. in regards to the Opening Brief. 00-13565
09/11/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to appellant Jackson from Jim Olmsted, Assistant Clerk-Attorney: in response to Mr. Jackson's letter dated July 17, 2000.
11/22/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 00-20523
11/22/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. SNP00A-1 (CY/RR/NB).
02/07/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. " . . . we affirm the judgment of conviction." SNP00A-1-CY/RR/NB 01-02508
03/06/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-02588
03/06/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/22/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 14, 2001. 01-02588