judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JALIL MUTAKABBIR V. EASTERN CARRY OUT CHINESE FOOD, ET AL

Case Information: 10-CV-1601
Short Caption:JALIL MUTAKABBIR V. EASTERN CARRY OUT CHINESE FOOD, ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Torts
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB8401-07Filed Date:12/17/2010

Opening Event Date:12/17/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/29/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/20/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJalil Mutakabbir NPro SeN
AppelleeEastern Carry Out Chinese FoodN
Harry J. CarletonNY
AppelleeWen B. Wang N
James F. Jordan NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/17/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (221 pgs/Ransom-Jones - 11/8 thru 11/10/10 proc. w/CD)
12/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (332 pgs/Shelton - 11/15 thru 11/17/10 proc.)
12/29/2010RECORD COMPLETED
01/05/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on December 17, 2010, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non- appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
01/06/2011RECORD INDEX
01/10/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 11/8/10, 11/9/10, 11/10/10, 11/15/10/11/16/10 & 11/17/10) (elp)
01/13/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellees' briefs shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
01/20/2011COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS aplt and enter aplt as pro se Granted
02/04/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 3/11/11
02/10/2011APLE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD w/documents attached all
03/11/2011RECEIVED - Appellant's Brief w/Appendix attached (submitted by Appellant pro se)
03/16/2011 On consideration of appellees' motion to supplement the record with the lodged documents that were part of the record in the trial court, to which no opposition has been filed, and appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and the appendix, the lodged brief and the appendix, and the motion of Andrew M. Sowell, Esquire, to withdraw his appearance as counsel of record for appellant, to which no oppositions have been filed, it is ORDERED that appellees' motion is granted, and the lodged documents will be forwarded to the Appeals Coordinator's Office for the transmittal to this court as a supplemental record. It is (MORE)
03/16/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that the motion of Andrew M. Sowell, Esquire, is granted ahd his appearance is hereby withdrawn as counsel of record for appellant. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant is deemed as proceeding on appeal pro se. It is (MORE)
03/16/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and the appendix is granted and the Clerk shall file the lodged brief of appellant and the appendix. It is (MORE)
03/16/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
03/16/2011APPENDIX - (*ATTACHED TO APPELLANT'S BRIEF)
03/16/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that appellees' brief shall be filed with this court on or before April 18, 2011. (ETW) elp
03/22/2011RECEIVED - courtesy ltr to aplt from Atty Jordan re exhibits.
03/22/2011MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE APPENDIX (did not comply w/rule 27)
03/22/2011RECEIVED - aplt's appdx.
03/23/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 - (Exhibits from the Superior Court Nos. 1-5, 9A-9C, 9E-9H)(one brown envelope)
04/06/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged appendix, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDEREd that appellant's motion for leave is granted and the lodged appendix is filed. It is (MORE)
04/06/2011APPENDIX
04/06/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that appellees' briefs remain due to be filed with this court on or before April 18, 2011. (JAC) elp
04/18/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE (both aples)
04/20/2011TMC - JOINT motion for summary affirmance - oppo & motion for oral argument
04/27/2011APPELLANT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE OPPOSITIONto 5/14/11
04/28/2011 ORDERED that the MOTION IS GRANTED and APPELLANT'S RESPONSE, if any, to appellees' joint motion for summary affirmance shall be filed NO LATER THAN MAY 16, 2011. (CASTILLO) LW
05/16/2011APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION to Motion for Summary Affirmance and Motion to issue Briefing Schedule and Set Oral Argument on the Merits (Filed in the After Hour Box in the Superior Court on Sunday, May 15, 2011)
06/28/2011 ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS GRANTED...SEE HARDCOPY It is ****MORE*****
06/28/2011 FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment on appeal IS AFFIRMED. (GLRDTE)
07/08/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR COSTS & ATTORNEY FEES filed by Attorney James F. Jordan
07/12/2011FiledTMC- MOTION FOR COSTS;OPPO
07/18/2011FiledOpposition to aple's motion for award of cost. (Appellant)
07/20/2011FiledMandate
08/30/2011FiledOrder Granting MOTION FOR COSTS