judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-94-00173-CR
07-94-00173-CR
04/20/1994
Other Felony
Carman, Steven Daniel
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/02/1997Mandate Issued
12/17/1996Motion to stay disposedOverruled
12/10/1996Case Returned from Higher Court
12/06/1996Motion to Stay Deadlines, Opinions, Mandate, etc.
07/31/1996Case Forwarded to Higher Court
07/25/1996Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
06/26/1996Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
06/14/1996Motion for Rehearing Filed
05/30/1996Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/04/1996Submitted
03/04/1996Submission
02/15/1996Submission
01/30/1996Motion to Vacate, i.e. Oral Submission, Stay or OrderGRANT
01/29/1996Motion to Vacate, i.e. Oral Submission, Stay or Order
01/12/1996Submission
11/21/1995Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
11/20/1995Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
11/13/1995Case ready to be set
11/13/1995Brief Filed
10/26/1995Supplemental Brief Filed
10/11/1995Extension of Time to File Supplemental Brief DispGRANT
10/04/1995Extension of Time to File Supplemental Brief Filed
08/23/1995Motion for extension of time to file brief filedGRANT
05/23/1995Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
05/22/1995Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
04/20/1995Brief Filed
02/22/1995Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
02/17/1995Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
12/21/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
12/20/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
10/25/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
10/21/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
09/22/1994Motion for leave to file (miscellaneous)GRANT
09/21/1994Do not use
09/20/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispGRANT
09/19/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
07/25/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispGRANT
07/20/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
07/12/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispGRANT
07/11/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
05/19/1994Do not use
04/20/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
04/20/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/02/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasMichael West
Carman, Steven DanielCriminal - AppellantSam Ogan
Trial Court Information
364th District Court
Lubbock
Honorable Bradley S. Underwood
92-415,353
10 yrs, TDC