judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HAMILTON (ROCHLON) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34891
Short Caption:HAMILTON (ROCHLON) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 37514
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C143369Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/27/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/27/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09204
10/21/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. " . . . we dismiss this appeal without prejudice to appellant's right to timely appeal from a final appealable order of the district court." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 99-10293
11/16/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-11320
11/16/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/03/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 30, 1999. 99-11320