judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KEVEN DANE SHEFFIELD v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0071)
Case Number:S-09-0071Case Docketed On:04/07/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Sheridan CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:KEVEN DANE SHEFFIELD v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:KEVEN DANE SHEFFIELD, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantKeven Dane SheffieldDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/07/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/07/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/07/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/26/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/27/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/27/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/03/2009Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiverMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
06/04/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for voluntary dismissal of appeal; and waiver of appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/04/2009Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
06/04/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal