judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

NATHAN A. FORRESTER V. NANCY N. PETROVIC

Case Information: 10-FM-1602
Short Caption:NATHAN A. FORRESTER V. NANCY N. PETROVICClassification:Appeals - Family - Support
Lead:10-FM-1602Consolidated: 11-FM-0071
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DRB3458-02Filed Date:12/16/2010

Opening Event Date:12/16/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/10/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/03/2011
Argued/Submitted:04/12/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/18/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
Appellant-Cross-AppelleeNathan A. Forrester N
Alan B. SoschinYY
Appellee-Cross-AppellantNancy N. Petrovic N
Judith L. WalterYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/16/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/10/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (157 pgs/tape) 6/12/08 proc.
01/10/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/14/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC)
01/28/2011 ORDERED, sua sponte, that the briefing order issued in appeal no. 10-FM-1602 is hereby vacated. It is (MORE)
01/28/2011ORDER, SUA SPONTE, CONSOLIDATING APPEALS 10-FM-1602 and 11-FS-71 are consolidated for all purposes herein. It is (MORE)
01/28/2011 ORDERED that the briefs shall be filed as follows: Opening brief (not to exceed 50 pages) of appellant/cross-appellee, and the appendix within 40 days from the date of this order; Responsive brief (not to exceed 50 pages) of appellee/cross-appellant, including opening brief of cross-appeal, within 30 days from the date of service of the opening brief of appellant/cross-appellee; Reply brief (not to exceed 20 pages) of appellant/cross-appellee, including response to the cross-appeal brief, within 21 days from the date of service of the response brief of appellee/cross-appellant; and Reply brief (not to exceed 20 pages) of appellee/cross-appellant, if any, within 21 days from the date of service of the reply brief of appellant/cross-appellee. (ETW)
02/03/2011RECORD INDEX (both)
02/03/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (exhibits)
03/09/2011APLT-X-APLE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo 30 days
03/21/2011ORDER GRANT APLT-X-APLE MO TO EXT TM TO FILE BRIEF and appendix shall be filed on or before April 11, 2011. (JAC)
04/11/2011APLT-X-APLE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 4 days
04/18/2011APLT-X-APLE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF and joint appendix
04/18/2011RECEIVED - aplts cross aple brief & appendix
05/10/2011ORDER GRANT APLT-X-APLE MO TO EXT TM TO FILE BRIEF and the lodged brief and joint appendix are filed. It is F/O that appellee/cross-appellant's brief shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (JAC)
05/10/2011APPELLANT/CROSS-APPELLEE'S BRIEF
05/10/2011APPENDIX (joint)
06/09/2011APLE-X-APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until June 20, 2011 (no oppo) (Petrovic)
06/20/2011RECEIVED - Appellee's/Cross-Appellant Brief
06/28/2011ORDER GRANT APLE-X-APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FILE BRIEF and the lodged brief is filed. It is F/O that appellant/cross-appellee's reply brief shall be filed within 21 days from the date of this order. (JAC)
06/28/2011APPELLEE/CROSS-APPELLANT'S BRIEF
07/19/2011FiledMotion cross aple motion for extension of time in which to file reply brief (Appellant) to August 21, 2011Granted
07/29/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion cross aple motion for extension of time in which to file reply brief (Appellant) to August 15, 2011
08/26/2011FiledOrder - directing motion & brief of appellant/cross-appellee
09/06/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File reply brief (Appellant-Cross-Appellee)Granted
10/03/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave to File reply brief (Appellant-Cross-Appellee)
10/03/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant-Cross-Appellee)
10/03/2011FiledBriefing Completed
10/24/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant-Cross-Appellee)
11/18/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
12/05/2011FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
12/09/2011FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant-Cross-Appellee)
03/01/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
04/12/2012FiledArgued before Glickman, Easterly, Epstein
04/26/2012FiledAffirmed In Part/Remanded In Part (MOJ) (Glickman and Easterly, Associate Judges, and Epstein, Associate Judge, Superior Court of the District of Columbia.*)
05/18/2012FiledMandate