judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-94-00389-CV
01-94-00389-CV
04/20/1994
Miscellaneous/other civil
Kowal, John and S.T. Searcy
Jocelyn Hingle
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/30/1995Mandate issued
10/10/1995Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
04/12/1995Case file received by higher Court or agency.
04/11/1995Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency
04/08/1995Writ Due
04/07/1995Writ filed
03/09/1995Extension of time to file mtn. for rehearing disp.Grant motion
03/09/1995Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
03/09/1995Motion for rehearing filed
03/02/1995Extension of time to file motion for rehearing
03/01/1995Motion for rehearing filed
02/09/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/09/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/01/1995Motion to stay disposedMotion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
12/12/1994Submitted
12/12/1994Submission
12/12/1994Submitted
10/20/1994Order enteredGrant motion
10/19/1994Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
10/17/1994Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
10/07/1994Motion to reset submission filed
09/26/1994Submission
08/19/1994Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
08/19/1994Case ready to be set
08/19/1994Case ready to be set
07/28/1994Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
07/13/1994Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
06/20/1994Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
06/09/1994Motion strans disposedGrant motion
06/09/1994Supplemental transcript filed
06/02/1994Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
05/20/1994Motion for leave to file strans
05/20/1994Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
05/20/1994Motion to stay appeal filed
04/20/1994Filing Fee in the amount of $50 paid-trans filed
04/20/1994Transcript filed
04/20/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
04/11/1994Appeal bond filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/30/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppellantAndrea Chan
StateAppelleeRichard P. Hogan Jr.
StateAppellee
StateAppelleeDavid Holman
StateAppelleeKevin H. Dubose
Trial Court Information
333rd District Court
Harris
Honorable RICHARD P. BIANCHI
92-18797