judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-94-00390-CV
01-94-00390-CV
04/20/1994
Miscellaneous/other civil
Johnson, R. Wayne
S. O. Kinney and J. W. Mossbarger
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/15/1995Mandate issued - criminal or civil
06/15/1995Mandate issued - criminal or civil
04/17/1995Extension to file writ disposedOverruled
03/13/1995Date final opinion release for publication
03/02/1995Writ filed
02/09/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/09/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/28/1994Submitted
11/28/1994Submission
11/28/1994Submitted
11/08/1994Submission
10/14/1994Case ready to be set
10/14/1994Case ready to be set
07/15/1994Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
07/07/1994Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
06/07/1994Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
05/27/1994Notice of dismissal
04/20/1994Transcript filed
04/20/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/30/1994Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/15/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StatePRO SER. Wayne Johnson
Trial Court Information
149th District Court
Brazoria
Honorable Robert Edward May
94I0003-3