judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: 94-0368
94-0368
04/21/1994
App Writ of Error
GAYE J. HOPKINS
ALAN E. ROBBINS D.P.M.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/13/1994Reply to ResponseRespondent
04/21/1994Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
07/19/1994Record returned to Court of AppealsNo Mo/Re filed
06/15/1994Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDeniedApp denied
05/13/1994Reply to Response
05/12/1994Case forwarded to Court
05/09/1994Notice requesting filing fee$5.00 Reply to App
04/21/1994Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
07/18/1994Case StoredCase stored.No Mo/Re filed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
ROBBINS, D.P.M., ALAN E.RespondentMs. Charlotte Edwards Patterson
Mr. Charles T. Frazier Jr.
Ms. Julia F. Pendery
HOPKINS, GAYE J.PetitionerMr. John David Hart
Court of Appeals Information:
02-93-00071-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
RULE 90, 01-12-94
2nd Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
342nd District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Joe Bruce Cunningham
342-129180-90