judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: 94-0363
94-0363
04/21/1994
App Writ of Error
CITY OF GRAND PRAIRIE
ROGER DAVID MILLS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/10/1994Reply to ResponseRespondent
04/21/1994Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
07/11/1994Record returned to Court of AppealsNo Mo/Re filed
06/08/1994Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDenied
05/12/1994Case forwarded to Court
05/10/1994Reply to Response
04/21/1994Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
07/11/1994Case StoredCase stored.No Mo/Re filed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
MILLS, ROGER DAVIDRespondentMr. Kim R. Thorne
Mr. John A. Goren
CITY OF GRAND PRAIRIEPetitionerMr. John M. Skrhak Jr.
Mr. Kevin T. Crocker
Court of Appeals Information:
11-93-00185-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
RULE 90, 02-10-94
11th Court of Appeals
Honorable BOB DICKENSON
Trial Court Information
68th District Court
Dallas
Honorable Gary Hall
92-101-C