judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-94-00231-CR
04-94-00231-CR
04/21/1994
Other Felony
Martinez, Fidel
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/02/2017Internal memo
04/04/1995Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
01/18/1995Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
01/13/1995Mandate Issued
01/13/1995Mandate Issued
11/23/1994Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/23/1994Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/09/1994Submitted
11/09/1994Submission
11/09/1994Submitted
10/18/1994Submission
09/30/1994Brief Filed
09/30/1994Case ready to be set
09/30/1994Case ready to be set
09/01/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/24/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
07/25/1994Brief Filed
06/29/1994No Description Available.
06/17/1994No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
06/01/1994No Description Available.
05/25/1994No Description Available.
05/13/1994Order Entered
05/05/1994No Description Available.
05/05/1994No Description Available.
04/21/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
04/08/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
03/31/1994Date of Sentencing in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/13/2020RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
08/02/2017Case StoredCase archived
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Martinez, FidelCriminal - AppellantLauro Benavides
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasOctavio Salinas, II
Trial Court Information
49th Judicial District Court
Webb
Honorable Manuel R. Flores
K93-490