judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-94-00652-CR
05-94-00652-CR
04/20/1994
Sale/Delivery of Cocaine
Beard, John
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/14/1997Mandate Issued
02/14/1997Mandate Issued
02/16/1996Case Returned from Higher Ct.
01/24/1996MattConv
11/29/1995Record Shipped
11/13/1995Petition for discretionary review due
11/13/1995Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
09/12/1995Ext to file Petition for Discretionary Review DispMotion or Writ Granted
09/12/1995Ext to File Petition for Discretionary Review-CCA
08/11/1995Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
07/18/1995Motion for Rehearing Filed
06/30/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/30/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/20/1995Submission
06/20/1995Submitted
06/20/1995Submission
06/20/1995Submitted
05/15/1995MattConv
03/03/1995MattConv
03/02/1995Brief Filed
03/02/1995Case ready to be set
03/02/1995Case ready to be set
02/24/1995Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/06/1995Brief Filed
02/06/1995Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/27/1995MattConv
01/04/1995Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/14/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/23/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
09/15/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
08/30/1994Statement of Facts Filed
08/17/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
08/15/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
07/25/1994Transcript Filed
04/20/1994Notice Sent
04/20/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
04/01/1994Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
04/01/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/14/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasSue Korioth
Beard, JohnCriminal - AppellantJan E. Hemphill
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 1
Dallas
Honorable Janice L. Warder
F93-68179-UH
15 yrs TDC