judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-2528
B-2528
01/26/1971
Application for Writ of Error
MAURICE WESTERFIELD, ET AL.
ARTHUR L. HUCKABY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/07/1972Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
12/20/1971Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/10/1971Response to Brief filedPetitioner
05/05/1971Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
02/09/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
01/26/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/07/1972Amicus Curiae Brief received
12/23/1971Response to Motion filed
12/20/1971Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/08/1971Dissenting opinion issued.
12/08/1971Opinion issued
05/10/1971Response to Brief filed
05/05/1971Supplemental Brief filed
03/10/1971Document received (See Remarks)
03/10/1971Document received (See Remarks)
02/09/1971Response to Petition
01/26/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
01/26/1971Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Barry BishopAmicus Curiae
Maurice Westerfield, et al.Petitioner
Arthur L. HuckabyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information