judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-2499
B-2499
01/14/1971
Application for Writ of Error
GUIDO BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, ET AL.
SAN ANTONIO FAIR, INC., CITY OF SAN ANTONIO
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/26/1971Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/29/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
01/25/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
01/14/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/31/1971Response to Motion filed
05/26/1971Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/29/1971Response to Petition
01/25/1971Response to Petition
01/14/1971Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/14/1971Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
City of San Antonio by and through City Public Service Board of San AntonioRespondent
San Antonio Fair, Inc.Respondent
Guido Brothers Construction Company, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information