judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROBERT S. CHEEK, II, d/b/a CHEEK REAL ESTATE SERVICES v. JACKSON WAX MUSEUM, INC., by and through its President, TIM SMITH

Case Heading (S-09-0063)
Case Number:S-09-0063Case Docketed On:03/27/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:ROBERT S. CHEEK, II, d/b/a CHEEK REAL ESTATE SERVICES v. JACKSON WAX MUSEUM, INC., by and through its President, TIM SMITH
Full Title:ROBERT S. CHEEK, II, d/b/a CHEEK REAL ESTATE SERVICES, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. JACKSON WAX MUSEUM, INC., by and through its President, TIM SMITH, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRobert S. Cheek IILeonard Robert Carlman
Christopher S. Leigh
AppelleeJackson Wax Museum, Inc.Vonde M. Smith
AppelleeTim SmithVonde M. Smith

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts, Property
Opinion Number:2009 WY 151
Citation:220 P.3d 1288 (Wyo. 2009)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/27/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/27/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/27/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/27/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/08/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
05/11/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief for the AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/25/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/26/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief for the AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/14/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/27/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
07/27/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Attachments).RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/27/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
08/04/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
08/10/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Christopher Leigh and Leonard Carlman for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/16/2009Event - Phone Call - contacted counsel for appellee regarding receipt acknowledgement - she will present oral argument on behalf of appellee.EventPhone CallFinal
09/23/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Leonard R. Carlman and Christopher S. Leigh, argument by Mr. Carlman for appellant; Vonde M. Smith for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
09/23/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
12/11/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Justice Kite writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/28/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/28/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/28/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/28/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/04/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 12/30/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal