judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

FRANK JOHNSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1584
Short Caption:FRANK JOHNSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related
Lead:10-CM-1584Consolidated: 11-CO-0954
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD11576-10Filed Date:12/16/2010

Opening Event Date:12/16/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/25/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/30/2011
Argued/Submitted:03/22/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/06/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantFrank JohnsonY
Bruce A. Johnson, Jr.YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
John P. MannarinoNY
Chrisellen R. KolbNY
Ademuyiwa BamiduroYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/16/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/03/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Bruce Johnson, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
01/03/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Bruce Johnson, Esquire
01/07/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
01/07/2011RECEIVED- aplt's motion for appeal transcript
01/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (85pgs/Tape) 10/13/10 proc.
01/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (11pgs/Tape) 10/15/10 proc.
01/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (19pgs/Tape) 11/18/10 proc. w/CD
01/25/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/31/2011RECORD INDEX
01/31/2011RECORD COPIES
02/01/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
02/24/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 60 days (no oppo)
03/10/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before May 13, 2011. (By: JAC)
03/31/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY - appeal pending 23-110 motion to vacate or set aside sentence
04/22/2011ORDERED: That the motion for stay is hereby held in abeyance for 90 days to permit the trial court to rule on the pending motion. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall advise this court on or before August 11, 2011, as to the status of the motion in the trial court. (By: ETW)
08/15/2011FiledOrder Denying appellant's motion for stay as moot in appeal no. 10-CM-1584, appellant's motion to consolidate is granted, appointing Bruce Johnson, Esquire, for appellant in appeal no. 11-CO-954, directing the record copies and record index for appeal no. 11-CO-954, and directing briefing
08/15/2011Filedconsolidated briefing Order
08/23/2011FiledRecord Index (11-CO-954)
08/23/2011FiledRecord Copies (11-CO-954)
09/26/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
09/26/2011FiledAppendix (Attached to Brief) (Appellant)
10/31/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief - until November 30, 2011 (Appellee)Granted
11/16/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee's motion for an extension of time to file the brief until November 30, 2011
11/30/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
11/30/2011FiledBriefing Completed
12/21/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
01/12/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
01/30/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
03/22/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Blackburne-Rigsby, Beckwith, Ferren
06/13/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Blackburne-Rigsby and Beckwith, Associate Judges, and Ferren, Senior Judge.)
07/06/2012FiledMandate