judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

COOPER (JIMMIE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36376
Short Caption:COOPER (JIMMIE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 54061 , 54206
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C157105Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/13/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/05/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/05/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-11369
07/18/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Transmit Judgment or Order and Record on Appeal. Certified copy of final order due: 30 days. Certified copy of the record on appeal due: 120 days. Record must include any previously prepared transcripts. fn2[The record shall not include exhibits filed in the district court.] 00-12374
08/10/2000Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of Order Denying Defendant's Motion for Appointment of Counsel, Defendant's Request to be Transported, Defendant's Motion for Transcripts and Defendant's Pro Per Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Post Conviction). Filed in district court on July 31, 2000 00-13926
11/13/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Mailed on: 11/09/00. 00-19840
11/13/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
03/26/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP01A-MS/DA/RR 01-05232
04/23/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-05267
04/23/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/11/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 7, 2001. 01-05267