judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BISHOP (SEAN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36375
Short Caption:BISHOP (SEAN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C122327
Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C123414
Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/17/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/05/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/05/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-11368
07/18/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Transmit Judgment or Order and Record on Appeal. Certified copy of final order due: 30 days. Certified copy of the record on appeal due: 120 days. Record must include any previously prepared transcripts. fn2[The record shall not include exhibits filed in the district court.] 00-12372
07/31/2000Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Judge Lee Gates. A written order has not been entered. Judge Gates will issue a written order after he renders a decision in this matter. 00-13187
09/29/2000Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order filed in district court on 08/10/00. 00-17204
09/29/2000Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy Notice of Entry of Order filed in district court on 8/14/00. 00-17205
10/03/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. 00-17476
11/17/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 3. 00-20238
11/17/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/14/2002Order/Procedural Order. The clerk of the district court shall have 30 days from the date of this order to transmit to the clerk of this court, as a supplemental record on appeal, a certified copy of the transcripts of the proceedings held in district court case number C122327 on June 19, 1995, May 17, 1999, June 13, 2000, July 25, 2000, and July 27, 2000. If the necessary transcripts have not yet been prepared and filed in the district court, the district court shall have 10 days from the date of this order to order the prompt preparation of the transcripts, shall deliver a copy of the district court's order to the clerk of this court within 15 days and shall have 10 days from the date the transcripts are filed in the district court to transmit to the clerk of this court a certified copy of the transcripts as a supplemental record on appeal. 02-08431
06/03/2002TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: May 17, 1999. Court Reporter: Richard L. Kangas. 02-09678
06/13/2002TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 6/13/00, 7/25/00, 7/27/00. Court Reporter: Yvonne Valentin. 02-10334
06/21/2002Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vol. 4. 02-10790
10/22/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn14[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP03-MS/ML/NB 02-18329
11/05/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On October 30, 2002, this court received from appellant a number of proper person documents and arguments in the appeal. In light of our order of October 22, 2002, affirming the district court's decision, we deny as moot any relief requested in the documents submitted on October 30, 2002. 02-19035
12/19/2002Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). SNP03-MS/ML/NB 02-21693
01/14/2003RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 03-00256
01/14/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/24/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 16, 2003. 03-00256