judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WYOMING OUTDOOR COUNCIL and POWDER RIVER BASIN RESOURCE COUNCIL v. WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, WATER QUALITY DIVISION and MARATHON OIL COMPANY and PETROLEUM ASSOCIATION OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0062)
Case Number:S-09-0062Case Docketed On:03/26/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Public Health and Safety (Title 35)
Short Title:WYOMING OUTDOOR COUNCIL and POWDER RIVER BASIN RESOURCE COUNCIL v. WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, WATER QUALITY DIVISION and MARATHON OIL COMPANY and PETROLEUM ASSOCIATION OF WYOMING
Full Title:WYOMING OUTDOOR COUNCIL and POWDER RIVER BASIN RESOURCE COUNCIL, Appellants (Petitioners), v. WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, WATER QUALITY DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent), and MARATHON OIL COMPANY and PETROLEUM ASSOCIATION OF WYOMING, Appellees (Intervenor-Respondents).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantWyoming Outdoor CouncilSteve Jones
AppellantPowder River Basin Resource CouncilSteve Jones
AppelleeDepartment of Environmental Quality - Water Quality DivisionBruce A. Salzburg
Jay Arthur Jerde
John S. Burbridge
AppelleeMarathon Oil CompanyBrent R. Kunz
John C. Martin
Lucas Evan Buckley
AppelleePetroleum Association of WyomingJohn A. Masterson

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Administrative Law and Procedure
Opinion Number:2010 WY 20
Citation:225 P.3d 1054 (Wyo. 2010)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/26/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/26/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/26/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/26/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/11/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/12/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of TimeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/12/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/15/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
06/17/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants' BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/30/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
07/30/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellee The Wyoming Department of Environmental Quality, Water Quality Division.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/31/2009Brief - Appellee - Joint brief of Marathon Oil Company and Petroleum Association of Wyoming.BriefAppelleeFinal
07/31/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Joint brief of intervenor-respondents Petroleum Association of Wyoming and Marathon Oil Company.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/19/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/28/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, four volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volumes II-IV, Agency Record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/28/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/17/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/28/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - John C. Martin for appellee Marathon Oil Company.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/14/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Steve Jones on behalf of AppellantsNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/22/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before court (Steve Jones for appellants; John S. Burbridge, Senior Assistant Attorney General, Brent R. Kunz, and John C. Martin, argument by Messrs. Burbridge and Martin for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
10/22/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
02/25/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Justice Kite writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/15/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/15/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/15/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/15/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/18/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 3/17/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal