judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

W. L. GOOGINS v. E. W. HABLE AND SON

Case: A-3160
A-3160
04/20/1951
Application for Writ of Error
W. L. GOOGINS
E. W. HABLE AND SON
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/01/1951Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
07/26/1951Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/15/1951Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
06/04/1951Response to PetitionRespondent
05/11/1951Amended PetitionPetitioner
04/20/1951Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/01/1951Brief in Support of Petition
07/26/1951Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/15/1951Supplemental Brief filed
06/04/1951Response to Petition
05/11/1951Amended Petition
04/20/1951Application for Writ of Error - Filed
04/20/1951Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
W. L. GooginsPetitioner
E. W. Hable and SonRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information