judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-4411
A-4411
12/01/1953
Application for Writ of Error
WESTCLIFF COMPANY, INC., ET AL.
EARLINE WALL
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/29/1954Motion for RehearingRespondent
02/25/1954Response to Brief filedPetitioner
02/24/1954Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
02/23/1954Response to Brief filedPetitioner
02/17/1954Brief on the MeritsRespondent
01/25/1954Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
12/11/1953Response to PetitionRespondent
12/01/1953Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/07/1954Response to Motion filed
05/05/1954Affidavit filed
04/30/1954Letter Filed
04/29/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/14/1954Opinion issued
02/25/1954Response to Brief filed
02/24/1954Supplemental Brief filed
02/23/1954Response to Brief filed
02/17/1954Brief on the Merits
01/25/1954Brief on the Merits
01/06/1954Response to Motion filed
01/06/1954Motion to supplement filedFiling granted
01/06/1954Document received (See Remarks)
12/21/1953Document received (See Remarks)
12/11/1953Response to Petition
12/01/1953Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
12/01/1953Document received (See Remarks)
12/01/1953Document received (See Remarks)
12/01/1953Document received (See Remarks)
12/01/1953Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Earline WallRespondent
Westcliff Company, Inc., et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information