judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-4422
A-4422
12/14/1953
Application for Writ of Error
TEXAS EMPLOYERS' INSURANCE ASSOCIATION
O.T. HAYWOOD
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/22/1954Supplement to ResponseRespondentRespondent's Second Supplemental Answer to Petitioner's Application for Writ of Error filed on behalf of O.T. Haywood
02/25/1954Supplement to ResponseRespondentRespondent's Supplemental Answer to Petitioner's Application for Writ of Error filed on behalf of O.T. Haywood
12/21/1953Response to PetitionRespondentRespondent's Answer to Petitioner's Application for Writ of Error filed on behalf of O.T. Haywood
12/14/1953Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitionerApplication for Writ of Error filed on behalf of Texas Employers' Insurance Association
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/07/1954Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment reversed; cause remanded to trial courtThe Court reverses the court of appeals judgment and remands the case to the trial court. Justice Robert W. Calvert delivered the opinion of the Court.
03/22/1954Supplement to ResponseRespondent's Second Supplemental Answer to Petitioner's Application for Writ of Error filed on behalf of O.T. Haywood
02/25/1954Supplement to ResponseRespondent's Supplemental Answer to Petitioner's Application for Writ of Error filed on behalf of O.T. Haywood
12/21/1953Response to PetitionRespondent's Answer to Petitioner's Application for Writ of Error filed on behalf of O.T. Haywood
12/14/1953Case Record Filed Record sent from the Seventh Court of Appeals - Appellant Brief, Appellee Brief and Motion for Rehearing, Opinion and Judgment, Transcript, and Statement of Facts
12/14/1953Application for Writ of Error - FiledApplication for Writ of Error filed on behalf of Texas Employers' Insurance Association
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Employers' Insurance AssociationPetitioner
Haywood, O. T.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information