judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-4421
A-4421
12/14/1953
Application for Writ of Error
FREDERICK VOLKMER
JAMES CURLEE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/01/1954Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/02/1954Reply to ResponsePetitioner
12/24/1953Response to PetitionRespondent
12/14/1953Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/03/1954Response to Motion filed
02/01/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/02/1954Reply to Response
12/24/1953Response to Petition
12/14/1953Application for Writ of Error - Filed
12/14/1953Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Frederick VolkmerPetitioner
James CurleeRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information