judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-4415
A-4415
12/04/1953
Application for Writ of Error
JESSE H. BENNETT, ET UX.
BROWN COUNTY WATER IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT NUMBER ONE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/17/1954Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
08/04/1954Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/03/1954Response to Brief filedRespondent
03/03/1954Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
12/14/1953Response to PetitionRespondent
12/04/1953Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/19/1955Miscellaneous MotionFiling granted
09/17/1954Brief in Support of Petition
09/15/1954Miscellaneous Motion
08/04/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/21/1954Dissenting opinion issued.
07/21/1954Opinion issued
03/03/1954Response to Brief filed
03/03/1954Supplemental Brief filed
01/27/1954Document received (See Remarks)
01/27/1954Document received (See Remarks)
12/14/1953Response to Petition
12/04/1953Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
12/04/1953Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Jesse H. Bennett, et ux.Petitioner
Brown County Water Improvement District Number OneRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information