judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANDREE' C. HARRINGTON V. STATE DEPARTMENT FCU

Case Information: 10-CV-1577
Short Caption:ANDREE' C. HARRINGTON V. STATE DEPARTMENT FCUClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAC8344-08Filed Date:12/14/2010

Opening Event Date:12/14/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/25/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAndree' C. Harrington NPro SeN
AppelleeState Department Federal Credit UnionN
Stephen G. HoweNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/14/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/07/2011 ORDERED that appellant shall, W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed as an ASSOCIATE JUDGE'S REVIEW of a MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S decision is a prerequsite for appeal... (BY: ETW)
01/07/2011TMC - OTSC - ROTSC
01/28/2011RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
02/03/2011 ORDERED that THIS APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction. See DC Code 11-1732 (k)(2001). (BRTEFA) (rm)
02/03/2011DISMISSED
02/25/2011MANDATE ISSUED