judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ALLSTATE INSURANCE CO. VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 36367
Short Caption:ALLSTATE INSURANCE CO. VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A409118Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/30/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Kravitz Schnitzer & Sloane, Chtd.--check no. 21012.
06/30/2000Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Prohibition. 00-11190
07/06/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Procedural Deficiency. Affidavit. Due Date: 10 days
07/13/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Verification. 00-12122
10/12/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. " . . . we deny the petition." SNP00A-WM/MS/NB 11/08/00 order: we vacate this order filed October 12, 2000, order denying the petition. 00-18032
11/08/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order Vacating Prior Order and Directing Answer and Supplement to Petition. We vacate the October 12, 2000, order denying the petition. We conclude that a supplement to the petition and an answer to the petition would assist this court. Petitioner shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file a supplement to the petition. The real parties in interest, on behalf of respondents, shall have 20 days thereafter to file an answer to the petition. The supplement and answer shall address the issues stated above. fn1[No extensions of time will be granted absent extreme and unforeseeable circumstances.] 00-19670
11/27/2000MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Petition. Stipulation to Withdraw Petition for Writ of Prohibition. 00-20655
01/04/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Petition. On November 27, 2000, the parties filed a stipulation to withdraw and dismiss this petition for a writ of prohibition because they have settled the matterw between them. We hereby approve the stipulaiton, and " . . . we dismiss this petition." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney's fees. Fn1[In light of this order, we vacate that portion of our November 8, 2000 order directing petitioner to supplement the petition and directing the real parties in interest to file an answer.] SNP00A-WM/ML/NB 01-00204
01/04/2001Case Status Update Case Closed. No notice in lieu of remittitur issued.