judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF THE GUARDIANSHIP AND CONSERVATORSHIP OF MARY AMSCHEL McEWAN; PETER AMSCHEL v. MELINDA W. REE and MARY SUSAN AMSCHEL, EDWARD T. AMSCHEL, and STEPHEN J. AMSCHEL

Case Heading (S-09-0054)
Case Number:S-09-0054Case Docketed On:03/19/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Sheridan CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Guardian and Ward (Title 3)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE GUARDIANSHIP AND CONSERVATORSHIP OF MARY AMSCHEL McEWAN; PETER AMSCHEL v. MELINDA W. REE and MARY SUSAN AMSCHEL, EDWARD T. AMSCHEL, and STEPHEN J. AMSCHEL
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE GUARDIANSHIP AND CONSERVATORSHIP OF MARY AMSCHEL McEWAN; PETER AMSCHEL, Appellant (Respondent), v. MELINDA W. REE, Appellee (Petitioner), and MARY SUSAN AMSCHEL, EDWARD T. AMSCHEL, and STEPHEN J. AMSCHEL, Appellees (Respondents).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantPeter Amschel Pro Se
AppelleeMelinda W. ReeTimothy S. Tarver
AppelleeMary Susan Amschel Pro Se
AppelleeEdward T. Amschel Pro Se
AppelleeStephen J. Amschel Pro Se
Other Particpants
Guardian ad litemHardy H. Tate

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/19/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/19/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/19/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/19/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/24/2009Motion - Dismiss - involuntaryMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
04/24/2009Memorandum - In support of motionMemorandumIn support of motionFinal
04/24/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum of Points and AuthoritiesEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/01/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
05/19/2009Order - Denying Motion to Dismiss AppealOrderDenyFinal
06/17/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/18/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/24/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
07/06/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/07/2009Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
07/10/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
07/10/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, one volume, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/10/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/01/2009Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
12/28/2009Event - Phone Call. Received call from counsel indicating that Ms. McEwan is deceased.EventPhone CallFinal
01/12/2010Order - Other - Order Requiring Notice of Death on the Record and Order to Show Cause Why This Appeal Should Not Be Dismissed as MootOrderOtherFinal
01/26/2010Notice-Incoming - Suggestion of deathNotice-IncomingSuggestion of deathFinal
01/27/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Notice - Suggestion of DeathEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/09/2010Response/Objection - OtherResponse/ObjectionOtherFinal
02/10/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's Response to Order to Show CauseEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/11/2010Event - Phone Call. Received call from Mr. Peter Amschel indicating that he had a response ready but he knows it will not be filed timely. He will send it Fed-X.EventPhone CallFinal
02/16/2010Response/Objection - Show cause order. Received response to order to show cause from appellant. Response is untimely - not filed, but notified court of receipt pending further direction.Response/ObjectionShow cause orderFinal
02/17/2010Order - Dismissing Appeal as Moot.OrderDismissingFinal
02/17/2010Notice-Internal - Other - Directed by Justices to return untimely response, unfiled.Notice-InternalOtherFinal
03/04/2010Petition - Reinstatement - Brief of Appellant (sic), Petition for Reinstatement. Petition filed by Appellee, made no appearance during briefing.PetitionReinstatementFinal
03/19/2010Motion - Other - Submit New EvidenceMotionOtherFinal
03/23/2010Order - Denying Petition for ReinstatementOrderDenyFinal
03/23/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/23/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/25/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 3/24/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal