judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STUART CORDELL VIGIL v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0053)
Case Number:S-09-0053Case Docketed On:03/19/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:STUART CORDELL VIGIL v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:STUART CORDELL VIGIL, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantStuart Cordell VigilDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Jenny Lynn Craig

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law, Criminal Law -Jury Instructions, Evidence
Opinion Number:2010 WY 15
Citation:224 P.3d 31

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/19/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/19/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/19/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/05/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
05/05/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/09/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/18/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
06/29/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/30/2009Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
07/09/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, four volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Jury Instructions & Verdict; Volume III, Transcripts; Volume IV, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/09/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/01/2009Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
02/16/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/04/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/04/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/04/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/04/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/08/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 3/5/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal