judyrecords
search tips
660 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

FT LINCOLN CIVIC ASSOC., ET AL. V. FT LINCOLN NEW TOWN CORP

Case Information: 10-CV-1576
Short Caption:FT LINCOLN CIVIC ASSOC., ET AL. V. FT LINCOLN NEW TOWN CORPClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB7132-02Filed Date:12/14/2010

Opening Event Date:12/14/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/25/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantFt Lincoln Civic AssociationN
Bruce J. TerrisNN
Jane M. Liu NN
AppellantMagdalene Cambell N
Jane M. Liu NN
Bruce J. TerrisNN
AppelleeFort Lincoln New Town CorporationN
Frederick Cooke, Jr.NY
AppelleeMichele V. Hagans N
Frederick Cooke, Jr.NY
AppelleeFort Lincoln N
Frederick Cooke, Jr.NY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/14/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/07/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANTS shall W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been PREMATURELY FILED as the Motion to Reopen remains pending in the trial court... (BY: ETW)
01/07/2011TMC - OTSC - ROTSC
01/18/2011RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
02/03/2011 ORDERED that this APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED as PREMATURELY FILED but W/O PREJUDICE to appellants filing a new appeal once all matters have been resolved. (BRTEFA) (rm)
02/03/2011DISMISSED
02/25/2011MANDATE ISSUED